Trustees TEES VALLEY ARTS

Charity number: 515369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL FRANCIS MCNULTY Chair 16 January 2012
None on record
George Graham Vasey Trustee 06 June 2018
NEW CONTEMPORARIES (1988) LIMITED
Received: On time
Craig Hannaway Trustee 14 December 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR Natasha Val Trustee 14 December 2017
None on record
Margaret Walters Trustee 08 June 2016
MIDDLESBROUGH FIRST
Received: On time
Ged Flanagan Trustee 02 March 2016
None on record
Michael Lavery Trustee 04 December 2014
None on record
James Frederick Ainslie Trustee 21 January 2014
THE HARTLEPOOL HOSPICE LIMITED
Received: On time