DERBYSHIRE CHINESE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 March 2017 31 days late Download