DERBYSHIRE CHINESE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.00k £27.14k £45.01k £31.56k £31.58k
Total expenditure £26.77k £29.31k £31.39k £45.87k £29.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.19k £4.69k £2.19k £2.69k £2.57k