Accounts and annual returns KING JAMES'S SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 515466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window