THE MYTON HOSPICES

Charity number: 516287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carmel de Nahlik Trustee 15 September 2021 None on record
Kelvin Beer-Jones Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record
Maria Cable Trustee 15 September 2021 None on record
Paul Taylor Trustee 18 September 2013 None on record
Dr Valerie Robson Trustee 20 August 2017 None on record
Karl Demian Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
Dr Michael Iredale Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
John Asbury Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Sarah Louise Faulkner Trustee 24 September 2019
ST MARY'S HALL TRUST Received: On time
NADIYA VIRANI-BLAND Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record