THE QUEEN ELIZABETH ACADEMY CHARITY

Charity number: 516412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.60k £37.49k £42.94k £59.18k £22.10k
Total expenditure £10.83k £38.13k £37.07k £54.09k £63.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A