THE QUEEN ELIZABETH ACADEMY CHARITY

Charity number: 516412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Allan Roper Trustee 14 July 2021 None on record
HUGH NETHERCOT Chair None on record
Neil Dirveiks Trustee 17 June 2020
WHITE HART COMMUNITY GROUPS Received: On time
Neil Alan Harding Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
Alison Bursnell Trustee 07 June 2018 None on record
Sara Anne Bishop Trustee 17 June 2021
OWEN STREET COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE Received: On time