ROTARY CLUB OF DARWEN EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity number: 516522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £11.98k £10.66k £11.38k £11.38k £12.05k
Total expenditure £14.88k £12.98k £8.83k £12.24k £9.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A