UW GIVING

Charity number: 516612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2016 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020
Total gross income £1.92m £2.17m £3.57m £3.99m £119.07k
Total expenditure £1.92m £2.17m £3.57m £3.99m £119.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.92m £2.17m £3.57m £3.99m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £2 £5 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.92m £2.17m £3.57m £3.99m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.92m £2.17m £3.57m £3.99m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A