UW GIVING

Charity number: 516612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 04 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 04 April 2018 19 November 2019 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 19 November 2019 288 days late Download
Annual return 04 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 04 April 2016 23 March 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 23 March 2017 47 days late Download