19TH DURHAM (NEVILLE'S CROSS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 516680
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2016 On time Download