19TH DURHAM (NEVILLE'S CROSS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 516680
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £30.69k £25.10k £47.08k £36.67k £24.73k
Total expenditure £24.92k £22.40k £37.84k £35.09k £31.47k