Financial history CLEMENTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.08k £5.38k £12.98k £3 £2.47k
Total expenditure £4.76k £4.96k £3.89k £3.24k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A