ST MICHAEL'S OVER 60'S CLUB

Charity number: 517056
Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 January 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 18 November 2017 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 23 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required