Accounts and annual returns AFRO-CARIBBEAN AND FRIENDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517170
Charity reporting is overdue by 1626 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 530 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 530 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 895 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 895 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1260 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1260 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1626 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1626 days