Accounts and annual returns HOLMFIRTH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 517460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required