PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 517497
Charity reporting is overdue by 444 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 444 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 444 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required