PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 517497
Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £15.79k £16.02k £23.05k £13.49k £16.37k
Total expenditure £14.68k £14.74k £14.94k £12.63k £17.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0