Trustees KING EDWARD MUSICAL SOCIETY OF MACCLESFIELD
Charity number: 517554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Veronica Spedding | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Pyatt | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gerald Tyler | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Lesley Davies Reynolds | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wanda Halina Johnson | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Alison Earl | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Shaw | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira Anne Taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Butler | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Green | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Blackburn | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MOSS | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD SPEDDING | Trustee | 01 July 2010 |
|
|||||
DAVID ARNOLD BUDGETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY SLY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.