Financial history HOSPICE OF ST MARY OF FURNESS

Charity number: 517738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.96m £3.16m £3.47m £4.33m £4.41m
Total expenditure £3.13m £3.33m £3.31m £3.40m £3.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £615.38k £604.42k N/A £184.86k £19.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.36m £1.31m £1.39m £1.78m £1.96m
Income - Other trading activities £907.52k £1.13m £1.26m £887.98k £1.49m
Income - Charitable activities £615.38k £604.42k £660.22k £1.53m £849.96k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.15k £39.58k £46.55k £29.60k £33.66k
Income - Other £71.21k £79.19k £107.13k £104.25k £81.95k
Income - Legacies £577.62k £432.97k £410.37k £470.12k £1.05m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.50m £2.40m £2.59m £2.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £721.72k £831.89k £915.76k £806.92k £911.46k
Expenditure - Governance £33.98k £35.67k £34.53k £34.19k £32.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £6.47k £0 £0 £10.59k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0