Accounts and annual returns APPLETON-LE-MOORS RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517744
Charity reporting is overdue by 1673 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 212 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 212 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 577 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 942 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 942 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1307 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1307 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1673 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1673 days