THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHOIRS AND MUSIC MOSELEY

Charity number: 518079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.57k £2.78k £10.42k £2.82k £542
Total expenditure £1.93k £1.98k £6.74k £3.07k £852
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A