THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHOIRS AND MUSIC MOSELEY

Charity number: 518079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pam Hall Trustee 12 February 2017 None on record
Dr MICHAEL JONES Trustee 19 February 2014 None on record
CATHIE CAREY Trustee 19 February 2014 None on record
Phil Hall Trustee 12 February 2017 None on record
Jennifer Carolyn Daniels Trustee 24 February 2021 None on record
DR JOHN ROBERT CAREY Trustee None on record
NEIL PATRICK GREENHALGH Trustee 02 November 2011 None on record
ROB BROWN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S MOSELEY Received: On time
MICK PERRIER Chair 02 November 2011 None on record
Jill Marigold Adams Trustee 24 February 2019 None on record