Financial history STRETTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 518447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.56k £1.56k £1.59k £1.61k £1.58k
Total expenditure £836 £580 £1.34k £405 £387
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A