LONGTOWN MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 518928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £40.33k £81.09k £68.10k £58.40k £47.96k
Total expenditure £29.39k £28.57k £105.07k £47.08k £66.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A