LONGTOWN MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 518928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Lewis Trustee 27 July 2020 None on record
HAZEL HIGHFIELD Trustee None on record
Tim Potts Doctor Chair 01 June 2015 None on record
Daniel Mazhindu Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
STUART LOVEJOY Trustee None on record
Marc Ashton Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
Dr Neil Rothwell Hughes Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record