Financial history FURNESS MARITIME TRUST

Charity number: 519627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.19k £7.73k £8.74k £20.82k £9.00k
Total expenditure £13 £3.06k £30.98k £14.02k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A