Accounts and annual returns POWER PLEAS TRUST

Charity number: 519654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required