Financial history POWER PLEAS TRUST

Charity number: 519654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £940 £28.72k £14.77k £11.98k £3.07k
Total expenditure £18.52k £32.39k £11.68k £6.44k £12.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A