Financial history BELAN OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 519839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £4.96k £2.06k £2.23k £1.67k £53
Total expenditure £1.42k £3.78k £1.52k £2.56k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A