Accounts and annual returns Trafford Sea Cadets

Charity number: 520003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window