Accounts and annual returns MOTTRAM ST ANDREW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window