Financial history MOTTRAM ST ANDREW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.26k £33.60k £33.46k £49.01k £21.60k
Total expenditure £33.26k £27.63k £27.05k £32.01k £18.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k