Accounts and annual returns 25TH SOUTH WEST CHESHIRE BOY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2024 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1035 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2022 | 515 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1400 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 16 January 2020 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window