Financial history 25TH SOUTH WEST CHESHIRE BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520172
Charity reporting is overdue by 1361 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.44k £13.33k £29.59k £32.70k £24.79k
Total expenditure £15.13k £8.22k £29.59k £32.70k £24.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A