Financial history 1ST HIGH LANE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.08k £25.20k £23.13k £26.42k £28.57k
Total expenditure £30.40k £21.33k £18.11k £24.63k £5.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.59k