Trustees 1ST HIGH LANE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lee Wilson Chair 25 September 2019
None on record
Steven Wood Trustee 10 September 2021
None on record
Matthew Parker Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Chloe Louise Johnson Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Adam Blaise Desforges Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Dr Jacquline Hand Trustee 30 June 2018
None on record
David Parker Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
HELEN WHITEHEAD Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
Claire Doust Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
Sarah Fenteman Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
PETER BARKE Trustee 30 September 2011
None on record
JEAN LUCY WILKINSON Trustee
None on record