LANGLEY MILL MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 520468
Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £19.54k £15.10k £20.87k £14.90k £15.06k
Total expenditure £26.24k £23.41k £21.77k £13.94k £12.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0