Financial history PINXTON MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520496
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £15.27k £18.79k £14.62k £6.64k £7.10k
Total expenditure £22.35k £17.94k £14.96k £13.97k £11.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A