Financial history STAVELEY MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 520522
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £63.25k £60.27k £43.93k £118.18k £80.84k
Total expenditure £41.33k £42.23k £42.34k £69.08k £42.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A