VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.18k £51.38k £29.76k £26.40k £11.52k
Total expenditure £48.04k £39.16k £34.12k £35.33k £10.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £11.50k N/A N/A £9.67k