CUMBRIA COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £140.75k £81.22k £93.10k £178.40k £146.82k
Total expenditure £126.54k £58.58k £95.11k £128.78k £106.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k