10TH MATLOCK (1ST WIRKSWORTH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520669
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.60k £24.65k £15.71k £28.01k £18.08k
Total expenditure £10.52k £9.03k £34.95k £21.27k £21.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £350 N/A