Financial history THE 1ST RIPLEY GROUP BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 520671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.49k £17.67k £18.53k £11.59k £20.84k
Total expenditure £16.27k £21.48k £18.27k £3.90k £8.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.50k £16.34k