Accounts and annual returns RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 520824
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required