Financial history SALFORD SEA CADETS (T S ILEX)

Charity number: 521094
Charity reporting is up to date (178 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.30k £10.90k £16.62k £7.93k £23.40k
Total expenditure £15.60k £14.12k £8.24k £11.72k £7.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.21k