NORBROOK YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 521238
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required