UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 521248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £490.13k £484.02k £466.52k £427.36k £247.44k
Total expenditure £525.93k £478.02k £427.53k £504.09k £213.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.46k