Financial history 1ST HOLMER, HEREFORD, SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.71k £15.36k £20.05k £18.97k £24.22k
Total expenditure £15.65k £12.79k £14.50k £17.58k £10.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.23k