Trustees 1ST HOLMER, HEREFORD, SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Carter Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Teresa Kim Carter Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Theresa Wood Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Heather Brazier Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Jackie Mumford Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Natalie Vernalls Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record